D. M. Conlon, Inc. v. Cherry Creek Recycling LLC et al
Plaintiff: D. M. Conlon, Inc.
Defendant: Cherry Creek Recycling LLC and The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00003
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Malcolm J Howard
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank regarding #11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Cherry Creek Recycling LLC. (Rudd, D.)
March 6, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Cherry Creek Recycling LLC filed by D. M. Conlon, Inc.. (Pocock, Donald)
February 26, 2020 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition regarding #20 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Cherry Creek Recycling LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Patrick Blair) (Poplin, Ashlee)
February 26, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Cherry Creek Recycling LLC filed by Cherry Creek Recycling LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Patrick Blair) (Poplin, Ashlee)
February 26, 2020 Filing 19 Financial Disclosure Statement by Cherry Creek Recycling LLC (Poplin, Ashlee)
February 26, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Ashlee B. Poplin on behalf of Cherry Creek Recycling LLC. (Poplin, Ashlee)
February 26, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Connell, Jordan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Jordan C. Connell on behalf of The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Connell, Jordan)
February 21, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion regarding #11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Cherry Creek Recycling LLC Limited Objection to Motion for Entry of Default against Cherry Creek Recycling, LLC filed by The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Price, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Guarantee Company of North America USA identifying Corporate Parent The Guarantee Company of North America (USA) Holdings, Ltd. for The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Price, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey S. Price on behalf of The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Price, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support regarding #11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Cherry Creek Recycling LLC filed by D. M. Conlon, Inc.. (Pocock, Donald)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Cherry Creek Recycling LLC filed by D. M. Conlon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Entry of Default as to Defendant Cherry Creek Recycling LLC) (Pocock, Donald)
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by D. M. Conlon, Inc.. Cherry Creek Recycling LLC served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Pocock, Donald)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by D. M. Conlon, Inc.. The Guarantee Company of North America USA served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Pocock, Donald)
January 23, 2020 Case transferred in from Eastern Division on 01/23/2020. Old Case Number 4:20-cv-11-H. (Rudd, D.)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Northern Division case. The Honorable Malcolm J. Howard, Senior United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 2:20-CV-3-H. No further filing shall be made in 4:20-CV-11-H. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/23/2020. (Rudd, D.)
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 Notice filed by D. M. Conlon, Inc. of Filing of Civil Cover Sheet. (Pocock, Donald)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Donald R. Pocock on behalf of D. M. Conlon, Inc.. (Pocock, Donald)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cherry Creek Recycling LLC, The Guarantee Company of North America USA. Notice to Counsel: . (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
January 23, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
January 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.)
January 23, 2020 Notice to Counsel: This case should have been filed in the Northern Division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 Notice filed by D. M. Conlon, Inc. Proposed Summons as to The Guarantee Company of North America USA. (Pocock, Donald)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Notice filed by D. M. Conlon, Inc. Proposed Summons as to Defendant Cherry Creek Recycling, LLC. (Pocock, Donald)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by D. M. Conlon, Inc. (Pocock, Donald)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5276027.), filed by D. M. Conlon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subcontract, #2 Exhibit B - Change Order #1, #3 Exhibit C - Payment Bond) (Pocock, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D. M. Conlon, Inc. v. Cherry Creek Recycling LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. M. Conlon, Inc.
Represented By: Donald R. Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Creek Recycling LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guarantee Company of North America USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?