The Estate of Martha Mackey DeMontpellier, v. Chicamacomico Banks Fire Department, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of Martha Mackey DeMontpellier
Defendant: Jeremy Carpenter and Chicamacomico Banks Fire Department, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00003
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
January 25, 2021 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by The Estate of Martha Mackey DeMontpellier. Jeremy Carpenter waiver sent on 1/21/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Ballew, Matthew)
January 25, 2021 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by The Estate of Martha Mackey DeMontpellier. Chicamacomico Banks Fire Department, Inc. waiver sent on 1/21/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Ballew, Matthew)
January 25, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert E. Zaytoun on behalf of The Estate of Martha Mackey DeMontpellier. (Zaytoun, Robert)
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by John R. Taylor on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Taylor, John)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew David Ballew on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ballew, Matthew)
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Jeremy Carpenter, Chicamacomico Banks Fire Department, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Wade M. Smith on behalf of The Estate of Martha Mackey DeMontpellier. (Smith, Wade)
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Melissa H. Hill on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hill, Melissa)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Redesignating Division to Northern Division. This case is redesignated as a Northern Division case. The Honorable Terrence W. Boyle, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents should reflect the new case number of 2:21-CV-3-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/19/2021. (Stouch, L.)
January 19, 2021 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Northern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
January 19, 2021 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 Notice filed by The Estate of Martha Mackey DeMontpellier, by and through Andre P. DeMontpellier as Executor regarding #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet. (Ballew, Matthew)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by The Estate of Martha Mackey DeMontpellier, by and through Andre P. DeMontpellier as Executor (Ballew, Matthew)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeremy Carpenter, Chicamacomico Banks Fire Department, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-5829318.), filed by The Estate of Martha Mackey DeMontpellier, by and through Andre P. DeMontpellier as Executor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Jeremy Carpenter, #2 Proposed Summons Chicamacomico Banks Fire Department, Inc.) (Ballew, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Martha Mackey DeMontpellier, v. Chicamacomico Banks Fire Department, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicamacomico Banks Fire Department, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Martha Mackey DeMontpellier
Represented By: Melissa H. Hill
Represented By: Wade M. Smith
Represented By: Matthew David Ballew
Represented By: John R. Taylor
Represented By: Robert E. Zaytoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?