Church Mutual Insurance Company v. Storm Team Construction, Inc. d/b/a Storm Team USA
Counter Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Counter Claimant: Storm Team Construction, Inc. d/b/a Storm Team USA
Case Number: 2:2021cv00031
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Goanos, Theodore)
September 3, 2021 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support regarding #11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Second Counterclaim filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Goanos, Theodore)
September 3, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Second Counterclaim filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Goanos, Theodore)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/13/2021. (Sellers, N.)
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Church Mutual Insurance Company by Storm Team Construction, Inc. d/b/a Storm Team USA. (Daly, Richard)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Donald C. Prentiss on behalf of All Defendants. (Prentiss, Donald)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Kyle P. Malone on behalf of Storm Team Construction, Inc. d/b/a Storm Team USA. (Malone, Kyle)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Richard D. Daly on behalf of Storm Team Construction, Inc. d/b/a Storm Team USA. (Daly, Richard)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Storm Team Construction, Inc. d/b/a Storm Team USA. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Church Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Church Mutual Holding Company, Inc. for Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Goanos, Theodore)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Theodore Nicholas Goanos on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Goanos, Theodore)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Theodore Nicholas Goanos on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Goanos, Theodore)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Storm Team Construction, Inc. d/b/a Storm Team USA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6136093.), filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment of Insurance Benefits and Directions to Pay, #3 Exhibit C - May 27, 2021 Email exchange, #4 Exhibit D - June 25, 2021 Email exchange, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons Summons) (Goanos, Theodore)
July 13, 2021 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
July 13, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is reminded for future filings, when using a fillable PDF form, the Court prefers that these forms be "flattened" pursuant to Section IV.B. of the Court's Electronic Policy and Procedure Manual available on the court's website. (Stouch, L.)
July 13, 2021 Notice to Counsel regarding: #3 Notice of Appearance. Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. The appropriate form for becoming a registered e-filer in this district is available to out of district counsel on this court's website www.nced.uscourts.gov. (Stouch, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church Mutual Insurance Company v. Storm Team Construction, Inc. d/b/a Storm Team USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore Nicholas Goanos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Storm Team Construction, Inc. d/b/a Storm Team USA
Represented By: Richard D. Daly
Represented By: Donald C. Prentiss
Represented By: Kyle P. Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?