Shkodrov et al v. Carmichael et al
Plaintiff: Blagomir P. Shkodrov and Petra D. Fist
Defendant: Summer Carmichael, Jeff Peter Vista, Aaron Heide, James Heaton, Jennifer Allen, Susanj Patel, Simone Patalinghug Montoya, ECU Health/EastCare, Inc., University Health Systems of Eastern Carolina, Inc., Chesapeaks Hospital Authority, Inc., Linda Smith, Eastern Radiologists, Inc. and Outer Banks Health, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv00002
Filed: January 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #29 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Complaint. Eastern Radiologists, Inc. and Simone Patalinghug Montoya answer due 5/1/2024. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/21/2024. Copy served by US mail to Blagomir P. Shkodrov and Petra Fist at 1209 Kirkwood Hwy, Wilmington, DE 19805 (Collins, S)
March 21, 2024 Filing 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by ECU Health/EastCare, Inc., Outer Banks Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Salsman, Jay)
March 21, 2024 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Linda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Salsman, Jay)
March 21, 2024 Filing 30 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Summer Carmichael, James Heaton, Jeff Peter Vista. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Salsman, Jay)
March 21, 2024 Motions Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #30 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint , #32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, #31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S)
March 20, 2024 Filing 29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Eastern Radiologists, Inc., Simone Patalinghug Montoya. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hiller, Joshua)
March 20, 2024 Filing 28 Financial Disclosure Statement by ECU Health/EastCare, Inc. (Salsman, Jay)
March 20, 2024 Filing 27 Financial Disclosure Statement by Outer Banks Health, Inc. (Salsman, Jay)
March 20, 2024 Filing 26 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jeff Peter Vista (Salsman, Jay)
March 20, 2024 Filing 25 Financial Disclosure Statement by Linda Smith (Salsman, Jay)
March 20, 2024 Filing 24 Financial Disclosure Statement by James Heaton (Salsman, Jay)
March 20, 2024 Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement by Summer Carmichael (Salsman, Jay)
March 20, 2024 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Jay C. Salsman on behalf of ECU Health/EastCare, Inc., Outer Banks Health, Inc.. (Salsman, Jay)
March 20, 2024 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance filed by Jay C. Salsman on behalf of Summer Carmichael, James Heaton, Linda Smith, Jeff Peter Vista. (Salsman, Jay)
March 20, 2024 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #15 Financial Disclosure Statement, #14 Notice of Appearance, #18 Financial Disclosure Statement, #16 Financial Disclosure Statement, #17 Financial Disclosure Statement. Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 requires that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. (Collins, S)
March 20, 2024 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #29 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S)
March 20, 2024 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1, a motion for extension of time must reflect the view of each opposing party, excluding incarcerated unrepresented parties, or the efforts to consult with any opposing parties to obtain their view. Counsel is directed to refile. (Collins, S)
March 19, 2024 Filing 20 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #29 ** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Eastern Radiologists, Inc., Simone Patalinghug Montoya. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hiller, Joshua) Modified on 3/20/2024 (Collins, S).
March 19, 2024 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua M. Hiller on behalf of Eastern Radiologists, Inc., Simone Patalinghug Montoya. (Hiller, Joshua)
March 19, 2024 Filing 18 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jeff Peter Vista (Salsman, Jay)
March 19, 2024 Filing 17 Financial Disclosure Statement by Linda Smith (Salsman, Jay)
March 19, 2024 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by James Heaton (Salsman, Jay)
March 19, 2024 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Summer Carmichael (Salsman, Jay)
March 19, 2024 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Jay C. Salsman on behalf of Summer Carmichael, James Heaton, Linda Smith, Jeff Peter Vista. (Salsman, Jay)
March 7, 2024 Filing 13 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Petra D. Fist. (Collins, S)
March 7, 2024 Filing 12 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Blagomir P. Shkodrov. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S)
February 12, 2024 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #6 Notice of Self-Representation, #5 Notice of Self-Representation. Wrong forms used. Plaintiffs shall revise and refile using this district's correct form, found on our website at www.nced.uscourts.gov. A copy of this Notice was sent via US mail to Blagomir P. Shkodrov and Petra Fist at 1209 Kirkwood Hwy, Wilmington, DE 19805 (Collins, S)
February 5, 2024 Filing 11 Letter from S. Collins, Deputy Clerk, to Blagomir P. Shkodrov and Petra D. Fist enclosing summonses issued to defendants. (Collins, S)
February 5, 2024 Filing 10 Summonses Issued as to Jennifer Allen, Summer Carmichael, Chesapeaks Hospital Authority, Inc., ECU Health/EastCare, Inc., Eastern Radiologists, Inc., James Heaton, Aaron Heide, Simone Patalinghug Montoya, Outer Banks Health, Inc., Susanj Patel, Linda Smith, University Health Systems of Eastern Carolina, Inc., Jeff Peter Vista. (Collins, S)
February 5, 2024 Filing 9 Notice Proposed Summons filed by Susanj Patel, Blagomir P. Shkodrov. (Collins, S)
February 5, 2024 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Petra D. Fist. (Collins, S)
February 5, 2024 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Blagomir P. Shkodrov. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope) (Collins, S)
February 5, 2024 Filing 6 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #13 ** Notice of Self-Representation filed by Petra D. Fist Wrong Form. (Collins, S) Modified on 3/7/2024 (Collins, S).
February 5, 2024 Filing 5 **CORRECTED AND REFILED AT #12 ** Notice of Self-Representation filed by Blagomir P. Shkodrov. Wrong Form (Collins, S) Modified on 3/7/2024 (Collins, S).
January 24, 2024 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.)
January 23, 2024 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Petra D. Fist. (Rudd, D.)
January 23, 2024 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Blagomir P. Shkodrov. (Rudd, D.)
January 23, 2024 Filing 2 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit (Selected Participants Only)by Blagomir P. Shkodrov, Petra D. Fist regarding #1 Complaint (Part 1 of 2 of Medical Records). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 2 of 2 of Medical Records) (Rudd, D.)
January 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405.00 receipt number 5-00008339), filed by Blagomir P. Shkodrov, Petra D. Fist. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shkodrov et al v. Carmichael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blagomir P. Shkodrov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petra D. Fist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Carmichael
Represented By: Jay C. Salsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Peter Vista
Represented By: Jay C. Salsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Heide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Heaton
Represented By: Jay C. Salsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susanj Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simone Patalinghug Montoya
Represented By: Joshua M. Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECU Health/EastCare, Inc.
Represented By: Jay C. Salsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Health Systems of Eastern Carolina, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeaks Hospital Authority, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Smith
Represented By: Jay C. Salsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Radiologists, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua M. Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outer Banks Health, Inc.
Represented By: Jay C. Salsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?