Lanier Construction Company, Inc. v. City of Clinton, North Carolina et al
Plaintiff: Lanier Construction Company, Inc.
Defendant: Paul Howard Construction Company, Inc., City of Clinton, North Carolina and John Connet
Objector: Brian Johnson
Case Number: 4:2011cv00036
Filed: March 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: GREENE
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Movants, City of Clinton, North Carolina and John Connet are allowed fees for printed or electronically recorded transcripts in the amount of $920.25. These costs are taxed against plaintiff, Lanier Construction Company, Inc. Movants request for costs for exhibits and shipping and handling are disallowed. Movants request for costs for mediation fees is disallowed. All other requests for costs not referenced in this summary are denied. Signed by Susan Edwards, Deputy for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 5/17/2013. (Edwards, S.)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 4/19/2013. (Edwards, S.)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that on or about April 27, 2011, the Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is DENIED, Defendant Howard Constructions Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and Defendants Motion to Quash was DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the remaining defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. As no live claims remain in this matter, the clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Susan Edwards, Deputy for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 2/20/2013. (Edwards, S.)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss by City of Clinton, North Carolina, John Connet. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/6/11. (Tripp, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanier Construction Company, Inc. v. City of Clinton, North Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Howard Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: James Nathan Duggins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Clinton, North Carolina
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Connet
Represented By: Norwood P. Blanchard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: Brian Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanier Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Demyra R. McDonald-Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?