Carmona v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Cindy Lynn Carmona
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 4:2013cv00102
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: CRAVEN
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiffs counsel be awarded fees in the total amount of $15,295.00. This amount represents 25% of the $61,180.00 in past-due benefits awarded to Plaintiff. Plaintiffs counsel is ORD ERED to return to Plaintiff the $18.00 counsel previously received as an award of attorney's fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act. Should Plaintiff's three children be awarded auxiliary benefits at some time in the future, Plaintiff may request additional attorney's fees under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) at that time. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 7/19/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
November 17, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion for Attorney Fees - Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 11/16/2014. (Tripp, S.)
September 4, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the court adopts the conclusions in the M&R. The plaintiffs motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED, defendants motion for judgment on the pleadings is DENIED, and this action is REMANDED to the Commissioner under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Susan Edwards, Deputy for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 9/4/2014. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmona v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Lynn Carmona
Represented By: Cynthia M. Currin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Todd J. Lewellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?