Walls v. Pitt County School Board of Education et al

Plaintiff: Billy R. Walls
Defendant: Pitt County School Board of Education, Beverly R. Emory and Pokie Noland
Case Number: 4:2013cv00104
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: PITT
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that in accordance with the courts order entered on February 3, 2014, and for the reasons set forth more specifically herein, Beverly R. Emory and Pokie Noland are DISMISSED as defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the court GRANTS defendants' motion for summary judgment. The clerk shall close the case. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 8/19/2015. (Jenkins, C.)
May 28, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING: 42 Motion to Seal; GRANTING 47 Motion Requesting Assistance in Scheduling Settlement Negotiations; and REFERRING this case to United States Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. for a court-hosted settlement conference. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 5/28/2015. A certified copy of this Order was sent via US Mail on 5/28/2015 to pro se plaintiff Billy R. Walls, 2401 Surrey Lane, Greenville, NC 27858. (O'Brien, C.)
February 3, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss. Beverly R. Emory and Pokie Noland are DISMISSED as defendants. The court ORDERS Walls to file, no later than February 18, 2014, an amended complaint containing all of his factual allegations concerning his race discrimination and retaliation claims under Title VII and 42 U.S.C. § 1983 in one document. Walls shall not assert any new claims in his amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 2/3/2014. A copy of the order was mailed to the pro se plaintiff. (Sawyer, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walls v. Pitt County School Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy R. Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pitt County School Board of Education
Represented By: Colin Alexander Shive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly R. Emory
Represented By: Colin Alexander Shive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pokie Noland
Represented By: Colin Alexander Shive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?