Perry v. Pamlico County et al

Plaintiff: Sonya Perry
Defendant: Pamlico County, Robert S. Johnson and Betsy Strag
Case Number: 4:2013cv00107
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: PAMLICO
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2015 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 76 Motion for Bill of Costs: Defendants are awarded costs in the amount of $2,558.11 for deposition transcripts pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1920(2). These costs are taxed against plaintiff and shall be included in the judgment. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 10/19/2015. (Jenkins, C.)
February 18, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING: 40 Motion for Summary Judgment and 70 Motion for Summary Judgment. In sum, the court GRANTS defendants' motions for summary judgment at 40 and 70 . The clerk shall close the case. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 2/18/15. (O'Brien, C.)
October 16, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 63 Motion for Extension of Time; granting [64 ] Motion for Leave to File; granting 65 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion to Seal. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/16/2014. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Pamlico County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Perry
Represented By: Walter M. Pence, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamlico County
Represented By: Kristen Yarbrough Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Johnson
Represented By: Kristen Yarbrough Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Strag
Represented By: Kristen Yarbrough Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?