Companion Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. W.O. White Trucking LLC et al

Plaintiff: Companion Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: W.O. White Trucking LLC, William O. White, Marty G. White, Delma O. White, Hilda D. White, Dow 1 LLC and PDWOW LLC
Case Number: 4:2014cv00055
Filed: April 7, 2014
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: PAMLICO
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Companion Property and Casualty Insurance Company against Dow 1 LLC, PDWOW LLC, W.O. White Trucking LLC, Delma O. White, Hilda D. White, Marty G. White, William O. White. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 10/25/2016. (Edwards, S.)
September 16, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Remaining Defendants. The following claims remain in this case: (1) a cross claim by PDWOW LLC against Dow 1 LLC, W.O. White Trucking LLC, Delma O. White, Marty G. White, and Wi lliam O. White; and (2) a cross claim by Delma O. White and Hilda D. White against PDWOW LLC and William O. White. Accordingly, cross claimants PDWOW LLC, Delma O. White, and Hilda D. White are ORDERED to notify the court within seven days of the filing date of this order whether they intend to pursue these claims. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 9/16/2016. (Edwards, S.)
August 4, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion to Dismiss and to Lift Stay. It is hereby ORDERED that the stay is lifted in this matter against Defendants W.O. White Trucking, LLC and Dow 1, LLC, and Plaintiff's Second Cause of Action is DISMISSED without prejudic e as to those defendants. Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit a report on the status of all claims against Defendants William White, Marty White, Delma White, and Hilda White no later than fourteen (14) days from the filing date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 8/4/2016. (Edwards, S.)
February 2, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court hereby STAYS all further proceedings in this matter pending the Plaintiffs completion of the construction projects identified in its Verified Complaint. The Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to notify this Court when all such construction projects have been completed and the final amount of its indemnity claim is known. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 2/2/2015. (Edwards, S.)
August 5, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion for Entry of Default against Defendants W. O. White Trucking, LLC, William O. White, Marty G. White and DOW I, LLC. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 8/5/2014. (Eggleston, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Companion Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. W.O. White Trucking LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Companion Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: William H. Sturges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.O. White Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William O. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty G. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delma O. White
Represented By: David J. Haidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda D. White
Represented By: David J. Haidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow 1 LLC
Represented By: David J. Haidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDWOW LLC
Represented By: Ramsay Tyler Archie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?