North Carolina Fisheries Association, Inc. et al v. Pritzker et al
Plaintiff: North Carolina Fisheries Association, Inc. and Carteret County Fisherman's Association, Inc.
Defendant: Penny Pritzker, Sally Jewell, Kathryn Sullivan, Daniel Ashe, John E. Skvarla, Louis Daniel and Gordon S. Myers
Case Number: 4:2014cv00138
Filed: August 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: CARTERET
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the court GRANTS the federal defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction [D.E. 42] and the state defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction [D.E. 67], and DISMISSES as moot defendant Myers's motions to dismiss [D.E. 31, 39]. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 7/22/2015. (O'Brien, C.)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 62 Motion to Stay Rule 26(f) Conference and Filing of Discovery Plan. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/6/14. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical dates and information. (O'Brien, C.)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 7 Motion to Correct Caption - The caption is hereby amended to correctly reference Dr. Kathryn Sullivan. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/6/2014. (Tripp, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Carolina Fisheries Association, Inc. et al v. Pritzker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina Fisheries Association, Inc.
Represented By: Wesley Charles Cooper
Represented By: Stevenson L. Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carteret County Fisherman's Association, Inc.
Represented By: Wesley Charles Cooper
Represented By: Stevenson L. Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Ashe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Skvarla
Represented By: Michael Elmer Bulleri
Represented By: Scott A. Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Daniel
Represented By: Michael Elmer Bulleri
Represented By: Scott A. Conklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon S. Myers
Represented By: Tamara Shields Zmuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?