Cox, Sr., et al. v. AGCO Corporation, et al.

Plaintiff: Jack Howard Cox, Sr., Craig Michael Cox, Valerie M. Cox and Charlotte Cox
Defendant: AGCO Corporation, Arvinmeritor, Borg-Warner Morse Tec, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Deere & Company, Inc., FMC Corporation, Ford Motor Company, Hennessy Industries, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Maremont Corporation, Meadwestvaco Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Navistar, Inc., Paccar, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC, Prestolite Performance, SPX Corporation, Standard Motor Products, Inc. and Star Machine & Tool
Case Number: 4:2016cv00084
Filed: June 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: PITT
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER granting 399 Motion to Dismiss. All of Plaintiff's claims against Standard Motor Products, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 12/20/2018. (Sellers, N.)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER granting 378 Motion to Dismiss. All of Plaintiff's claims against McCord Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREWDICE, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 11/20/2018. (Sellers, N.)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting 311 Motion to Dismiss. The Defendant SPX are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/12/2018. (Sellers, N.)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER granting 303 Motion to Dismiss. The action of Plaintiff, JACK HOWARD COX, SR., Executor of the Estate of PERCY RAY COX against Defendant CUMMINS INC. be dismissed without prejudice, and each party to bear its own fees and costs.To the extent that any cross-claims by or against Defendant CUMMINS INC., thosecross-claims are also hereby dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/23/2018. (Sellers, N.)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting 238 Motion to Dismiss. The claims of the Plaintiff, Jack Howard Cox, Sr., Executor of the Estate of Percy Ray Cox, Deceased, against Defendant AGCO Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. To the extent that any cross-claims by or against Defendant AGCO Corporation exist, those cross-claims are also hereby dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 2/2/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting 213 Motion to Dismiss. The claims of the Plaintiff, Jack Howard Cox, Sr., Executor of the Estate of Percy Ray Cox, Deceased, against Defendant METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear their own costs. To the extent that any cross-claims by or against Defendant METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY exist, those cross-claims are also hereby dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/27/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting 148 Motion for Entry of Default against defendant Prestolite Performance, successor to Hayes Performance Brakes. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/13/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting 179 Motion for Clarification of expert discovery deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 9/12/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting 177 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/14/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. All claims against Paccar, Inc. are hereby dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/29/2016. (Briggeman, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox, Sr., et al. v. AGCO Corporation, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Howard Cox, Sr.
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Michael Cox
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie M. Cox
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Cox
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGCO Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvinmeritor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Morse Tec, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Levy
Represented By: Jon S. Player
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Represented By: Tracy E. Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Christopher R. Kiger
Represented By: Addie K.S. Ries
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessy Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maremont Corporation
Represented By: William P Early
Represented By: Carter T. Lambeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadwestvaco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith E. Coltrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Timothy W. Bouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestolite Performance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Corporation
Represented By: Gary L. Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Motor Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Machine & Tool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?