Divine Mercy, LLC

Plaintiff: Divine Mercy, LLC
Claimant: Claimant
Case Number: 4:2017cv00077
Filed: June 5, 2017
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: PAMLICO
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:183
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Default Judgment. A judgment of exoneration by default is hereby entered against all parties and claimants having an interest in this matter, other than Rafael Olmos, and for any claims not yet filed by any party. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/13/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
September 15, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Entry of Default against all other parties having an interest in this matter, and as to all claims arising from the Voyage at issue, except the Claim asserted by Rafael Olmos, in this action. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/15/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
June 6, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion to Authorize Security. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 6/6/2017. (Briggeman, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Divine Mercy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Divine Mercy, LLC
Represented By: Marissa M. Henderson
Represented By: David N. Ventker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Claimant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?