Dudley v. City of Kinston et al
Plaintiff: Howard Dudley
Defendant: City of Kinston and Anthony Greene
Case Number: 4:2018cv00072
Filed: April 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: LENOIR
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER - The court ADOPTS the findings and conclusions in the order of December 15, 2020 [D.E. 172], OVERRULES the objections [D.E. 180, 181], and AFFIRMS the order [D.E. 172]. The court expects compliance with the conclusion of Judge Numbers's order. This court trusts that there will not be more litigation about "the appropriate amounts of fees and expenses." Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/30/2021. (Sellers, N.)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting 235 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/26/2021. (Sellers, N.)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion to Compel. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 3/31/2021. (Sellers, N.)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 149 Motion to Compel. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 2/8/2021. (Sellers, N.)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting 136 Motion to Seal. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 1/4/2021. (Sellers, N.)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting 83 Motion to Compel; denying 87 Motion for Protective Order; denying 89 Motion for Protective Order; denying 114 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 12/1/2020. (Sellers, N.)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying 74 Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 11/23/2020. (Sellers, N.)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying 127 Motion to Strike 125 Memorandum in Support. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 10/6/2020. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information. (Stouch, L.)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER denying 85 Motion to Quash. Corrigan must produce responsive documents no later than 14 days after entry of this order at the address listed on the subpoena. Corrigan and the Defendants may agree on an alternative timeline or place of production. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 9/18/2020. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Stouch, L.)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 92 Motion to Strike 90 RESPONSE in Opposition; granting 97 Motion to Strike 87 First MOTION for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion to Strike 89 Corrected MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 9/15/2020. (Stouch, L.)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 69 Motion for Leave to Take Second Deposition of Johnnye Thomas Waller. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 4/30/2020. (Sellers, N.)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 63 Motion for Discovery - Release of Records. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 12/7/2019. (Sellers, N.)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Consent PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 8/9/2019. (Sellers, N.)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding MOTION for Release of DSS Records - Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 8/8/2019. (Sellers, N.)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying without prejudice 38 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 7/30/2019. (Sellers, N.)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Release of Guardian ad Litem Records. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/20/2019. (Sellers, N.)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 12/5/2018. (Sellers, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudley v. City of Kinston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Dudley
Represented By: David S. Rudolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kinston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?