Goss v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Jennifer Nicole Goss
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 4:2018cv00127
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: BEAUFORT
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - US Attorney General served with summons and complaint on 8/6/2018. (Stouch, L.)
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 USM 285 Form - US Attorney served with summons and complaint on 8/9/2018. (Stouch, L.)
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - Nancy Berryhill served with summons and complaint on 8/2/2018. (Stouch, L.)
July 27, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Stouch, L.)
July 27, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill filed by Jennifer Nicole Goss. (Stouch, L.)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 7/25/2018. (Stouch, L.)
July 27, 2018 Remark - Copies of #1 IFP Motion, #4 Order, #5 Complaint, #6 Summonses, and USM 285 Forms given to US Marshals for service. (Stouch, L.)
July 26, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jennifer Nicole Goss (Cox, Hugh)
July 26, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Hugh Dalton Cox, Jr on behalf of Jennifer Nicole Goss. (Cox, Hugh)
July 25, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-4] Financial Disclosure Statement. This is a stand alone document. Counsel must refile using the event "Other Documents - Financial Disclosure Statement". (Rudd, D.)
July 25, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding [1-3] Notice of Attorney Appearance. This is a stand alone document. Counsel must refile using the event "Notices-Notice of Appearance". (Rudd, D.)
July 25, 2018 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Stouch, L.)
July 23, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Jennifer Nicole Goss. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Attorney Appearasnce, #4 Financial Disclosure, #5 Summons Berryhill, #6 Summons US Attorney, #7 Summons Attorney General, #8 USM Berryhill, #9 USM US Attorney, #10 USM Attorney General) (Cox, Hugh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goss v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Nicole Goss
Represented By: Hugh Dalton Cox, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?