Potter et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Estate of Linda H. Potter and Hal C. Potter
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2018cv00167
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 31:3545
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States of America answer due 1/17/2019. It is further ORDERED that the associated deadlines contained in Rules 16 and 26 shall also be EXTENDED by 45 days. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/28/2018. (Sellers, N.)
November 27, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Attendant Deadlines in Rules 16 and 26. (Sellers, N.)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Attendant Deadlines in Rules 16 and 26 filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bishop, Kyle)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Kyle L. Bishop on behalf of United States of America. (Bishop, Kyle)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Estate of Linda H. Potter, Hal C. Potter served on United States Attorney, United States of America c/o Attorney General and Internal Revenue Service on 10/11/2018; 10/15/2018. (Noreen, Douglas)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Service filed by Estate of Linda H. Potter, Hal C. Potter regarding #1 Complaint, . (Noreen, Douglas)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas David Noreen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Noreen, Douglas)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Estate of Linda H. Potter (Noreen, Douglas)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Hal C. Potter (Noreen, Douglas)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel is reminded to print summonses and effect service. (Sellers, N.)
October 5, 2018 Case transferred in from Western Division on 10/05/2018. Old Case Number 5:18-cv-476. (Sellers, N.)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as an Eastern Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, Chief United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 4:18-CV-167-D. No further filing shall be made in 5:18-CV-476-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/5/2018. (Sellers, N.)
October 5, 2018 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Eastern division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
October 5, 2018 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
October 5, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Estate of Linda H. Potter, Hal C. Potter. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
October 4, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number RAL067254. (Sellers, N.)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 90021G.), filed by HAL C. POTTER, ESTATE OF LINDA H. POTTER, by and through HAL C. POTTER, Executor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 2012 Amended Tax Return, #5 Certified Mail Receipts, #6 IRS Response Letter to Potters, #7 Jones Letter to IRS, #8 IRS Response Letter to Jones, #9 IRS Account Transcript) (Noreen, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potter et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Linda H. Potter
Represented By: Douglas David Noreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hal C. Potter
Represented By: Douglas David Noreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle L. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?