Gregory v. Whitney et al
Plaintiff: Jeane Gregory
Defendant: Richard Whitney and Gust Rosenfeld PLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00081
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative MOTION to Change Venue. (Collins, S.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative MOTION to Change Venue filed by Jeane Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proof of Diversity of Citizenship, #2 Exhibit B- Glaser and Whitney/Rosenfeld PLC Emails, #3 Exhibit C- Petition for Order to Show Cause, #4 Exhibit D- Copy of minute entry from Maricopa County Superior Court of Arizona, #5 Exhibit E- Copy of mission, vision and core values of the State Bar of Arizona, #6 Exhibit F- California "Last Will and Testament" of Susana Sabado) (Rudd, D.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Jeane Gregory as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative MOTION to Change Venue. Response due by 7/15/2019. (Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina.) (Collins, S.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Defendant Richard Whitney by Gust Rosenfeld PLC (Meeker, Emily)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support regarding #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative MOTION to Change Venue filed by Gust Rosenfeld PLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles W. Wirken) (Meeker, Emily)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative, MOTION to Change Venue filed by Gust Rosenfeld PLC. (Meeker, Emily)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Gust Rosenfeld PLC (Meeker, Emily)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow on behalf of Gust Rosenfeld PLC. (Zinkow, Nathaniel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Emily M. Meeker on behalf of Gust Rosenfeld PLC. (Meeker, Emily)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by David William Long on behalf of Gust Rosenfeld PLC. (Long, David)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service filed by Jeane Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS receipts, #2 Exhibit Proof of service) (Collins, S.)
June 4, 2019 Notice of Pro Se E-Noticing - Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina. All documents filed in CM-ECF will be served on this party via email pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 5.1. (Collins, S.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gust Rosenfeld PLC, Richard Whitney. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Gust Rosenfeld) Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Jeane Gregory. (Rudd, D.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Jeane Gregory. (Rudd, D.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gust Rosenfeld PLC, Richard Whitney (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number NEW001013), filed by Jeane Gregory. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Whitney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeane Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gust Rosenfeld PLC
Represented By: Nathaniel Cosmo Zinkow
Represented By: David William Long
Represented By: Emily M. Meeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?