Lilley v. Saul
Plaintiff: Christy L. Lilley
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv00093
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Process Receipt and Return served on Commissioner of Social Security on 7/5/19. (Collins, S.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 Process Receipt and Return served on US Attorney General on 7/9/19. (Collins, S.)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed as to Andrew M. Saul served on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (Tripp, S.)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM285 US Attorney, #2 USM285 US Atty General, #3 USM285 Commissioner Soc Security) (Collins, S.)
June 27, 2019 Remark - Certified copy of Order #4 and file-stamped copies of summonses, complaint, notice of self representation and financial disclosure statement forwarded to U.S. Marshal, along with USM-285 forms. (Collins, S.)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul filed by Christy L. Lilley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Decision, #2 Exhibit 2 - Port Health Records, #3 Exhibit 3 - Physical Residual Function Capacity Statement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Medical Certification for Application & Renewal of Disability Placard, #5 Exhibit 5 - Verification of Need for Reasonable Accomodation, #6 Exhibit 6 - Letter from Community Management Corporation dated 3/6/17, #7 Exhibit 7 - Carteret General Hospital, #8 Exhibit 8 - Statement of Claimant or other person, #9 Exhibit 9 - Letter dated 11/8/16, #10 Exhibit 10 - Function Report - Adult) (Collins, S.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaint and issue the summonses prepared by Plaintiff. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve the summonses and a copy of the complaint on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 6/26/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Christy L. Lilley, 1102 Pine St., Apt. C, Beaufort, NC 28516.) (Collins, S.)
June 25, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Collins, S.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Christy L. Lilley. (Rudd, D.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Christy L. Lilley. (Rudd, D.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Christy L. Lilley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1- Notice of Decision, #3 Exhibit 2- Port Health Records, #4 Exhibit 3- Physical Residual Function Capacity Statement, #5 Exhibit 4- Medical Certification for Application & Renewal of Disability Placard, #6 Exhibit 5- Verfication of Need for Reasonable Accommodation/Modification, #7 Exhibit 6- Letter from Community Management Corporation dated 3/6/2017, #8 Exhibit 7- Carteret General Hospital, #9 Exhibit 8- Statement of Claimant or other person, #10 Exhibit 9- Letter dated 11/8/16, #11 Exhibit 10- Function Report - Adult - Third Party, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed Summons) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lilley v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy L. Lilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?