Harris et al v. Vanderburg et al
Plaintiff: William Harris and Phyllis Harris
Defendant: Douglas Matthew Gurkins, Remco East, Inc., Mary Grace Bishop and Mary Jane Vanderburg
Case Number: 4:2019cv00111
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph B. Dupree, II on behalf of Douglas Matthew Gurkins. (Dupree, Joseph)
October 3, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Mary Jane Vanderburg. (Bridgers, Jonathan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 25 Bishop ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Mary Jane Vanderburg by Mary Grace Bishop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Property Management Agreement) (Beard, Gaines)
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 Remco East ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Mary Jane Vanderburg by Remco East, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Property Management Agreement) (Beard, Gaines)
October 2, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Douglas Matthew Gurkins' Consent Motion for Extension of Time #23 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including October 25, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/2/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
October 2, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Douglas Matthew Gurkins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Allowing Extension of Time) (Duke, W.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 22 Financial Disclosure Statement by Douglas Matthew Gurkins (Duke, W.)
October 2, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance filed by W. Gregory Duke on behalf of Douglas Matthew Gurkins. (Duke, W.)
September 26, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Gaines Spencer Beard, Jr on behalf of Mary Grace Bishop, Remco East, Inc.. (Beard, Gaines)
September 25, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance filed by Luis Juan Pinto on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Pinto, Luis)
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Harris, Phyllis Harris. Douglas Matthew Gurkins served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Clarke, Kelly)
September 3, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting the Consent Motion for Extension of Time #17 filed by Defendants Mary Grace Bishop and Remco East, Inc. For good cause shown, it is ordered that these defendants have up to and including October 3, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/3/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
September 3, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Mary Grace Bishop, Remco East, Inc.. (Rapp, William)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 Notice filed by William Harris Notice of List of EDNC certified mediators. (Attachments: #1 court notice of mediation selection, #2 ednc list of certified mediators) (Clarke, Kelly)
August 28, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Mary Jane Vanderburg's Motion for Extension of Time #15 . For good cause shown, and with the consent of Plaintiffs, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including October 3, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/28/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
August 28, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Mary Jane Vanderburg. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bridgers, Jonathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Harris. Mary Grace Bishop served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Clarke, Kelly)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phyllis Harris. Remco East, Inc. served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Clarke, Kelly)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Harris. Mary Jane Vanderburg served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Clarke, Kelly)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Mary Jane Vanderburg (Bridgers, Jonathan)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Jonathan Vann Bridgers on behalf of Mary Jane Vanderburg. (Bridgers, Jonathan)
August 21, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by William Harris (Brancart, Christopher)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Phyllis Harris (Brancart, Christopher)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Christopher Brancart on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Brancart, Christopher)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Ayanda Dowtin Meachem on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Meachem, Ayanda)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Mary Grace Bishop, Douglas Matthew Gurkins, Remco East, Inc., Mary Jane Vanderburg. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
August 12, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Phyllis Harris (Clarke, Kelly)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by William Harris (Clarke, Kelly)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kelly Anne Clarke on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Clarke, Kelly)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT William and Phyllis Harris against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5057267.), filed by William Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Vanderburg, #3 Proposed Summons Gurkins, #4 Proposed Summons Remco East, #5 Proposed Summons Bishop) (Clarke, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. Vanderburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Matthew Gurkins
Represented By: W. Gregory Duke
Represented By: Joseph B. Dupree, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remco East, Inc.
Represented By: William Walter Rapp
Represented By: Gaines Spencer Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Grace Bishop
Represented By: William Walter Rapp
Represented By: Gaines Spencer Beard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jane Vanderburg
Represented By: Jonathan Vann Bridgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Harris
Represented By: Kelly Anne Clarke
Represented By: Luis Juan Pinto
Represented By: Ayanda Dowtin Meachem
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Harris
Represented By: Kelly Anne Clarke
Represented By: Luis Juan Pinto
Represented By: Ayanda Dowtin Meachem
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?