Patrick v. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency
Plaintiff: Randall Patrick
Defendant: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency
Case Number: 4:2019cv00113
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Alejandro Rettig y Martinez on behalf of Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Rettig y Martinez, Alejandro)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas F. Burke on behalf of Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Burke, Thomas)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response regarding #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 10/11/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/23/2019. Sent to Randall Patrick at 1212 Red Banks Rd. L-8 Greenville, NC 27858 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
August 23, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Sellers, N.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Randall Patrick. (Attachments: #1 Duplicate Motion and attached letters received from the court and Defendant's attorney's office) (Sellers, N.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Randall Patrick. (Sellers, N.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Randall Patrick. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response due by 9/12/2019. Sent to Randall Patrick at 1212 Red Banks Rd. L-8 Greenville, NC 27858 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support regarding #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Wyatt, Scott)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 DISREGARD. Wrong event used to file document. Corrected and re-filed at #8 . PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency (Wyatt, Scott) Modified on 8/19/2019 (Sellers, N.).
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wyatt, Scott)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency (Wyatt, Scott)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Scott F. Wyatt on behalf of Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Wyatt, Scott)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file a Notice of Self Representation sent to Pro Se Plaintiff Randall Patrick at 1212 Red Banks Rd., #L-8, Greenville, NC 27858 mailed via US mail on August 14, 2019. A copy of notice along with a blank notice of self representation and a blank financial disclosure statement. (Rudd, D.)
August 14, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice filed by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplemental Cover Sheet) (Wyatt, Scott)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency from Pitt County District Court, case number 19 CVD 1954. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5059284), filed by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Servicing Contract, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Notice of Removal) (Wyatt, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick v. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency
Represented By: Scott F. Wyatt
Represented By: Alejandro Rettig y Martinez
Represented By: Thomas F. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?