Battle v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daron Battle
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc. and Casey Negley
Case Number: 4:2019cv00123
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Reissued as to Casey Negley. (Herrmann, L.)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Hayes, Christie)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Christie M. Hayes on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Hayes, Christie)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Christie M. Hayes on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Hayes, Christie)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Christie M. Hayes on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Hayes, Christie)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Daron Battle as to Casey Negley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Alias Summons) (Perry, Cedric)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Christie M. Hayes on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Hayes, Christie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Christie M. Hayes on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Hayes, Christie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 DISREGARD - Corrected document filed at #16 . Financial Disclosure Statement by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Hayes, Christie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support regarding #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Hayes, Christie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Hayes, Christie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Daron Battle served on CT Corporation System, Registered Agent for Ruby Tuesday, Inc. on September 30, 2019. (Perry, Cedric)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Cedric R. Perry on behalf of Daron Battle. (Perry, Cedric)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Daron Battle (Perry, Cedric)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 CORRECTED COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5087476.), filed by Daron Battle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Perry, Cedric) Modified on 9/4/2019 to reflect corrected. (Rudd, D.)
September 4, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Herrmann, L.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Casey Negley, Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
September 3, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Daron Battle. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
September 3, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
September 3, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 requires that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. (Rudd, D.)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 REFILED AT DE #3 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5087476.), filed by Daron Battle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Perry, Cedric) Modified on 9/4/2019 to reflect that text searchable complaint was refiled at DE #3 . (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battle v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Represented By: Christie M. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Negley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daron Battle
Represented By: Cedric R. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?