Mays v. Combs
Plaintiff: Morris J. Mays
Defendant: David Combs
Case Number: 4:2019cv00135
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response due by 12/14/2019. Sent to Morris J. Mays at 1208 Bermuda Road Rocky Mount, NC 27801 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support regarding #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by David Combs. (Gumm, Stephanie)
November 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by David Combs. (Gumm, Stephanie)
November 13, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #9 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (Sellers, N.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 Document: Proof of Service as to David Combs filed by Morris J. Mays. (Sellers, N.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 Document: Proof of Service as to Dvaid Combs, Mayor of City of Rocky Mount received from the Nash County Sheriff's Office. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Sellers, N.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 Rule 12 Letter Issued as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response due by 11/11/2019. Sent to Morris J. Mays at 1208 Bermuda Road Rocky Mount, NC 27801 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Stephanie L. Gumm on behalf of David Combs. (Gumm, Stephanie)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support regarding #9 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by David Combs. (Ellis, J.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by David Combs. (Ellis, J.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by David Combs (Ellis, J.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by J. Nicholas Ellis on behalf of David Combs. (Ellis, J.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by J. Nicholas Ellis on behalf of David Combs. (Ellis, J.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by J. Nicholas Ellis on behalf of David Combs. (Ellis, J.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to David Combs. Summons issued at intake. (Rudd, D.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Morris J. Mays. (Rudd, D.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Morris J. Mays. (Rudd, D.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Combs (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number GRN002275), filed by Morris J. Mays. (Attachments: #1 Supporting documents to complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris J. Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Combs
Represented By: J. Nicholas Ellis
Represented By: Stephanie L. Gumm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?