Grady F. Smith and Co., Inc., et al v. Nautilus Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Grady F. Smith and Co., Inc., d/b/a Scaffoldmart and M.C.J., LLC
Defendant: Nautilus Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00010
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Grady F. Smith and Co., Inc., M.C.J., LLC as to Nautilus Insurance Company. (Ayers, James)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 1/30/2020. (Sellers, N.)
January 30, 2020 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Grady F. Smith and Co., Inc., M.C.J., LLC (Ayers, James)
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by James M. Ayers, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Ayers, James)
January 29, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #7 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion Of Appraisal. (Sellers, N.)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion Of Appraisal filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Policy, #2 Exhibit B- (Proposed) Order) (O'Brien, Kevin)
January 24, 2020 Filing 6 Notice filed by Nautilus Insurance Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Filed Notice Of Removal) (Hartzell, William)
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel James M. Ayers II of Ayers & Haidt. P.A. at Post Office Box 1544, New Bern, North Carolina 28569 mailed via US Mail on January 23, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
January 22, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by William R. Hartzell on behalf of Nautilus Insurance Company. (Hartzell, William)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Michael O'Brien on behalf of Nautilus Insurance Company. (O'Brien, Kevin)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Nautilus Insurance Company (O'Brien, Kevin)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nautilus Insurance Company from Craven County Superior Court, case number 19cvs1908. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 26N05EC8), filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A- Pleadings) (O'Brien, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grady F. Smith and Co., Inc., et al v. Nautilus Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: William R. Hartzell
Represented By: Kevin Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grady F. Smith and Co., Inc., d/b/a Scaffoldmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.C.J., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?