Wiggins v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Toni Wiggins
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00015
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 4/15/2020. (Sellers, N.)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/25/2020. Motions due by 12/18/2020. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 3/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Form) (Sellers, N.)
March 9, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 3/9/2020. (Sellers, N.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Order regarding #12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Speedway LLC. (Evert, Jill)
March 3, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
March 3, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #12 Motion for Protective Order. The Consent Proposed Protective Order does not have all of Judge Dever's preferred language, which can be found on his preference page on the court's website. Please amend the proposed order and re-file it using the event 'Proposed Order' found in the Responses and Replies category. (Sellers, N.)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Speedway LLC. Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/28/2020. (Sellers, N.)
February 26, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. (Sellers, N.)
February 26, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Evert, Jill)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Speedway LLC. (Evert, Jill)
February 20, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #10 Discovery Plan. Counsel is reminded that all pleadings must comply with Local Rule 10.1(a) in regards to spacing, which you may obtain on the court's website at www.nced.uscourts.gov. Your documents must be double-spaced. Please re-file the document in compliance with this rule. (Sellers, N.)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 DISREGARD. Corrected and re-filed at #11 . REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Speedway LLC. (Evert, Jill) Modified on 2/20/2020 (Sellers, N.).
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Jill April Evert on behalf of Speedway LLC. (Evert, Jill)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Toni Wiggins (Quinn, Nancy)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/6/2020. (Sellers, N.)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Nancy P. Quinn on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Quinn, Nancy)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Speedway LLC. (Pratt, Elizabeth)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Howe Pratt on behalf of Speedway LLC. (Pratt, Elizabeth)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Nancy P. Quinn of The Quinn Law Firm at 315 Garden Street, Suite 1D, Greensboro, NC 27401 mailed via US Mail on 1/24/2020. (Rudd, D.)
January 24, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Speedway LLC identifying Corporate Parent MPC Investment LLC for Speedway LLC. (Pratt, Elizabeth)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Speedway LLC from North Carolina Superior Court of Greene County, case number 2019-CV-5304. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5280733), filed by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Supplemental Removal Coversheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court) (Pratt, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiggins v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Howe Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?