Newman et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Rhonda Newman and Dell Allen Newman
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00034
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dell Allen Newman, Rhonda Newman. Monsanto Company served on 4/15/2020, answer due 5/6/2020. (McGlamry, Michael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Lynwood P. Evans on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Evans, Lynwood)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher S. Edwards on behalf of Dell Allen Newman, Rhonda Newman. (Edwards, Christopher)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Rhonda Newman (McGlamry, Michael)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Dell Allen Newman, Rhonda Newman (McGlamry, Michael)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Joshua A. Karr on behalf of Dell Allen Newman, Rhonda Newman. (Karr, Joshua)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Michael L. McGlamry on behalf of Dell Allen Newman, Rhonda Newman. (McGlamry, Michael)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5329282.), filed by Dell Allen Newman, Rhonda Newman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons - Monsanto) (McGlamry, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Newman
Represented By: Michael L. McGlamry
Represented By: Christopher S. Edwards
Represented By: Joshua A. Karr
Represented By: Lynwood P. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dell Allen Newman
Represented By: Michael L. McGlamry
Represented By: Christopher S. Edwards
Represented By: Joshua A. Karr
Represented By: Lynwood P. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?