United States of America v. Powell
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Marsha Benita Powell
Case Number: 4:2020cv00044
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Marsha Benita Powell. (Sellers, N.)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Marsha Benita Powell served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Prince, Asia)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Marsha Benita Powell. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Asia J. Prince on behalf of United States of America. (Prince, Asia)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marsha Benita Powell, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Initial Decision and Order Dated February 20, 2018, #2 Exhibit B - Demand for Payment Dated April 20, 2018, #3 Exhibit C - Demand for Payment Dated September 25, 2018, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Prince, Asia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Benita Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Asia J. Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?