Davis v. G. Allen Equipment Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Davis
Defendant: G. Allen Equipment Corporation and William Lawrence
Case Number: 4:2020cv00049
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time #17 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Defendants, it is ordered that Plaintiff has up to and including May 26, 2020, within which to respond to the Partial Motion to Dismiss #13 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/14/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
May 14, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Stouch, L.)
May 14, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Antonio Davis. (Hinton, Meredith)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/28/2020. (Stouch, L.)
April 24, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Jefferson, Katie)
April 24, 2020 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support regarding #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Jefferson, Katie)
April 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Jefferson, Katie)
April 24, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
March 27, 2020 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by Antonio Davis (Hinton, Meredith)
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Meredith S. Hinton on behalf of Antonio Davis. (Hinton, Meredith)
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by William Lawrence (Jefferson, Katie)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by G. Allen Equipment Corporation (Jefferson, Katie)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 Notice filed by G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence Notice of Filing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Amended Notice of Removal) (Jefferson, Katie)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert Hugh Griffin on behalf of G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Griffin, Robert)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Action Summons purportedly served on G. Allen, #2 Exhibit B - Superior Court Action Complaint purportedly served on G. Allen, #3 Exhibit C - Superior Court Action Summons purportedly served on William Lawrence, #4 Exhibit D - Superior Court Action Complaint purportedly served on William Lawrence, #5 Exhibit E - Amended Notice of Removal sent to Superior Court) (Jefferson, Katie) Modified on 3/20/2020 (Stouch, L.).
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. The time for Defendants G. Allen Equipment Corporation and William Lawrence to serve an Answer or otherwise plead is and shall be extended to and including April 24, 2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/19/2020. Copy sent to Meredith S. Hinton of Ricci Law Firm, P.A. at P. O. Box 483, Greenville, NC 27835 mailed via US Mail on March 19, 2020. (Stouch, L.)
March 19, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Stouch, L.)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Meredith S. Hinton of Ricci Law Firm, P.A. at P. O. Box 483, Greenville, NC 27835 mailed via US Mail on March 19, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
March 19, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
March 19, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jefferson, Katie)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Katie Terry Jefferson on behalf of G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Jefferson, Katie)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by William Lawrence, G. Allen Equipment Corporation from Halifax County Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 124. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5360715), filed by William Lawrence, G. Allen Equipment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Action, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal sent to Superior Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Jefferson, Katie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. G. Allen Equipment Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Davis
Represented By: Meredith S. Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Allen Equipment Corporation
Represented By: Katie Terry Jefferson
Represented By: Robert Hugh Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lawrence
Represented By: Katie Terry Jefferson
Represented By: Robert Hugh Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?