Pritchard v. Mobley et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Pritchard
Defendant: Aaron M Mobley and City of Washington
Case Number: 4:2020cv00060
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: The case number is incomplete. It should be reflected on your pleadings as 4:20-CV-60-M. All future pleadings should reflect the case number as 4:20-CV-60-M. No need to refile anything at this time. (Edwards, S.)
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 Financial Disclosure Statement by City of Washington (Collier, Clay)
April 27, 2020 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Aaron M Mobley (Collier, Clay)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Clay Allen Collier on behalf of City of Washington. (Collier, Clay)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Clay Allen Collier on behalf of Aaron M Mobley. (Collier, Clay)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by City of Washington. City of Washington waiver sent on 4/6/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Collier, Clay)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Aaron M Mobley. Aaron M Mobley waiver sent on 4/6/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Collier, Clay)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 Notice filed by Teresa Pritchard regarding #1 Complaint, of Typographical Error. (Mahoney, Carlos)
April 6, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Edwards, S.)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Sean P. Cecil on behalf of Teresa Pritchard. (Cecil, Sean)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Washington, Aaron M Mobley. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Teresa Pritchard (Mahoney, Carlos)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Carlos E. Mahoney on behalf of Teresa Pritchard. (Mahoney, Carlos)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5381252.), filed by Teresa Pritchard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Defendant Mobley, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons for Defendant City of Washington) (Mahoney, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pritchard v. Mobley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron M Mobley
Represented By: Clay Allen Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Washington
Represented By: Clay Allen Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Pritchard
Represented By: Sean P. Cecil
Represented By: Carlos E. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?