Woods v. PruittHealth, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Woods
Defendant: PruittHealth Veteran Services - North Carolina, Inc. and PruittHealth, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00075
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Case Stayed pursuant to #10 Order. (Sellers, N.)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Compel. The Court finds that a valid agreement to arbitrate exists between the Plaintiff and Defendants with respect to the claims asserted in Plaintiffs Complaint. Defendants' Motion to Compel is ALLOWED, and, pursuant to 9 U.S.C. 3, this matter is STAYED pending completion of arbitration in this matter. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/24/2020. (Sellers, N.)
June 24, 2020 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #8 Consent MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. (Sellers, N.)
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support regarding #8 Consent MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by PruittHealth Veteran Services - North Carolina, Inc., PruittHealth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dispute Resolution Policy, #2 Exhibit Signed Acknowledgment) (McKnight, Michael)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by PruittHealth Veteran Services - North Carolina, Inc., PruittHealth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McKnight, Michael)
June 2, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time #7 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including June 25, 2020 within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/2/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
June 2, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Sellers, N.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by PruittHealth Veteran Services - North Carolina, Inc., PruittHealth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Extension of Time) (Riggins, Alyssa)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Alyssa Riggins on behalf of PruittHealth Veteran Services - North Carolina, Inc., PruittHealth, Inc.. (Riggins, Alyssa)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Douglas McKnight on behalf of PruittHealth Veteran Services - North Carolina, Inc., PruittHealth, Inc.. (McKnight, Michael)
May 7, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number RAL078465 (Rodriguez, M.)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to PruittHealth Veteran Services - North Carolina, Inc., PruittHealth, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Gwendolyn Woods (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Fong, Wilson)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Wilson F. Fong on behalf of Gwendolyn Woods. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Fong, Wilson)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Gwendolyn Woods. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Fong, Wilson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. PruittHealth, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PruittHealth Veteran Services - North Carolina, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PruittHealth, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Woods
Represented By: Wilson F. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?