Swanson et al v. Young's Truck Center, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kevin W Swanson and Kathleen R Swanson
Defendant: Dennis Antoinne Artis and Young's Truck Center, Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00093
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 THIRD Notice to Counsel - All Counsel is required to file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Local counsel should file a notice of appearance. (Stouch, L.)
June 24, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT (Signed) against Dennis Antoinne Artis, Young's Truck Center, Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5447285.), filed by Kathleen R Swanson, Kevin W Swanson. (Bachara, Mark)
June 23, 2020 SECOND Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Complaint. Local counsel has not signed the document. Counsel is directed to refile the document with local counsel's electronic signature. See Local Civil Rule 83.1(d). All Counsel is required to file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Local counsel should file a notice of appearance. (Stouch, L.)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by John R. Vivian on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Vivian, John)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dennis Antoinne Artis, Young's Truck Center, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
June 2, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel is required to file a Notice of Appearance or a Notice of Special Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a) and 81.1(e). (Rudd, D.)
June 2, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Local counsel has not signed the document. Counsel is directed to refile the document with local counsel's electronic signature. See Local Civil Rule 83.1(d). (Rudd, D.)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kevin W Swanson (Bachara, Mark)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Kathleen R Swanson (Bachara, Mark)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5447285.), filed by Kathleen R Swanson, Kevin W Swanson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Bachara, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson et al v. Young's Truck Center, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin W Swanson
Represented By: Mark R. Bachara
Represented By: John R. Vivian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen R Swanson
Represented By: Mark R. Bachara
Represented By: John R. Vivian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Antoinne Artis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young's Truck Center, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?