Keen v. Saul
Plaintiff: Shannon Keen
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv00099
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service for US Marshals 285 Form - Summons and Complaint served on Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security on 7/13/2020. (Waddell, K.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service for US Marshals 285 Form - Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney General on 7/8/2020. (Waddell, K.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service for US Marshals 285 Form - Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Attorney on 7/6/2020. (Waddell, K.)
June 5, 2020 Remark - Copy of the #4 Order and file stamped copies of the complaint, summonses, financial disclosure statement and notice of appearance forwarded to the US Marshal for service, along with USM-285 forms. (Waddell, K.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal 285 Forms) (Waddell, K.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Shannon Keen. (Waddell, K.)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the complaint and issue the summonses prepared by Plaintiff, and the United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve the summonses and a copy of the complaint on Defendant. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 6/5/2020. (Waddell, K.)
June 4, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . (Waddell, K.)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Shannon Keen (Arrowood, Derrick)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Derrick Kyle Arrowood on behalf of Shannon Keen. (Arrowood, Derrick)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Shannon Keen. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal Form, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Arrowood, Derrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keen v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Keen
Represented By: Derrick Kyle Arrowood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?