Target Contractors, LLC et al v. All Phase Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Target Contractors, LLC
Defendant: All Phase Solutions, LLC and Argonaut Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00131
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard E Myers
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Counsel is reminded to read the Order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/21/2020. (Waddell, K.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Marino, Peter)
August 21, 2020 Filing 21 Financial Disclosure Statement by Argonaut Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Argo Group US, Inc., Corporate Parent Argo Financial Holding (Ireland) UC, Corporate Parent Argo Irish Holdings I, Ltd., Corporate Parent Argo Irish Holdings II, Ltd., Corporate Parent Argo Solutions, SA, Corporate Parent Argo Re Ltd., Corporate Parent Argo Group International Holdings, Ltd. for Argonaut Insurance Company. (Marino, Peter)
August 21, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Peter J. Marino on behalf of Argonaut Insurance Company. (Marino, Peter)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by All Phase Solutions, LLC. (Marino, Peter)
August 10, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT Of Service on Argonaut Insurance Company by Target Contractors, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - NC Department of Insurance Receipt of Service on behalf of Argonaut Insurance) (Hamlet, H.)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for All Phase Solutions, LLC to serve an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended by 21 days, to and including August 17, 2020. Counsel is reminded to read the Order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/24/2020. (Waddell, K.)
July 24, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Waddell, K.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint,, filed by All Phase Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Consent Motion for Extension of Time) (Marino, Peter)
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by All Phase Solutions, LLC (Marino, Peter)
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Peter J. Marino on behalf of All Phase Solutions, LLC. (Marino, Peter)
July 15, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #13 Affidavit of Service. Counsel indicated the incorrect division. In future filings, please reference the Eastern Division in the case caption. Additionally, counsel did not properly identify exhibits pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual (i.e., "Exhibit A" is not a sufficient description). The deputy clerk will correct the docket text. No action by counsel required at this time. (Waddell, K.)
July 15, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #11 Notice of Special Appearance, #12 Notice of Special Appearance. Counsel indicated the incorrect division. In future filings, please reference the Eastern Division in the case caption. No action by counsel required at this time. (Waddell, K.)
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Target Contractors, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Return of Service as to defendant All Phase Solutions, LLC) (Marlowe, Brett) Modified on 7/15/2020 to correct document description in docket text (Waddell, K.).
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Brett A. Marlowe on behalf of Target Contractors, LLC. (Marlowe, Brett)
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Brian W. Bennett on behalf of Target Contractors, LLC. (Bennett, Brian)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by H. Mark Hamlet on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hamlet, H.)
July 7, 2020 SECOND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #2 Notice of Special Appearance, #3 Notice of Special Appearance, #5 Notice of Special Appearance, and #6 Notice of Special Appearance. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. A completed Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form must first be submitted to the address provided on the form: Clerk of Court, United States District Court, Attention: ECF Attorney, Registration Post Office Box 25670, Raleigh, NC 27611. Counsel is directed to refile. (Waddell, K.)
July 2, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #8 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Additionally, counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. In future filings, counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. The deputy clerk will flatten the document. (Waddell, K.)
July 2, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #2 Notice of Special Appearance, #3 Notice of Special Appearance, #5 Notice of Special Appearance, and #6 Notice of Special Appearance. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. A completed Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form must first be submitted to the address provided on the form: Clerk of Court, United States District Court, Attention: ECF Attorney, Registration Post Office Box 25670, Raleigh, NC 27611. Counsel is directed to refile. (Waddell, K.)
July 2, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #2 Notice of Special Appearance, #3 Notice of Special Appearance, #5 Notice of Special Appearance, #6 Notice of Special Appearance. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. (Waddell, K.)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Phase Solutions, LLC and Argonaut Insurance Company. (Waddell, K.)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Target Contractors, LLC (Hamlet, H.) (Main Document 8 flattened and replaced on 7/2/2020) (Edwards, S.).
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Nicole Barnett Slaughter on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Slaughter, Nicole)
June 30, 2020 REMINDER TO COUNSEL regarding #1 . Pursuant to Judge Myers Practice Preferences, counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of any motion, memorandum, or brief which exceeds 30 pages or of any exhibits which exceed a total of 30 pages, by mailing or delivering to the attention of the Clerk, U.S. District Court, 1003 South 17th Street, Wilmington, NC 28401. The courtesy copies of any motion, memorandum, or brief and supporting exhibits which exceed a combined total of 100 pages shall be submitted in a three-ring binder. (Waddell, K.)
June 30, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Waddell, K.)
June 30, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.1(e), Out of District Counsel shall file his/her own notice of special appearance so that they will be listed on the docket sheet and receive a Notice of Electronic Filing "NEF". (Rudd, D.)
June 30, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Target Contractors, LLC. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by H. Mark Hamlet on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Special Appearance) (Hamlet, H.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by H. Mark Hamlet on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Special Appearance) (Hamlet, H.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by H. Mark Hamlet on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hamlet, H.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by H. Mark Hamlet on behalf of Target Contractors, LLC, The United States of America for the use and benefit of Target Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Special Appearance) (Hamlet, H.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by H. Mark Hamlet on behalf of Target Contractors, LLC, The United States of America for the use and benefit of Target Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Special Appearance) (Hamlet, H.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Phase Solutions, LLC, Argonaut Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5495280.), filed by Target Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons of APS, #3 Proposed Summons Summons of Argonaut, #4 Index Index of Complaint Exhibits, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A Payment Bond, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B Target Contract, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C Target letter to All Phase Solutions, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D Target Change Order 1, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E Email on backfill, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F Pay Application 5, #11 Appendix Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Exhibit Target Financial Disclosure) (Hamlet, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Target Contractors, LLC et al v. All Phase Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Phase Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter J. Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Target Contractors, LLC
Represented By: H. Mark Hamlet
Represented By: Brett A. Marlowe
Represented By: Nicole Barnett Slaughter
Represented By: Brian W. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?