Stallings v. American National Red Cross
Plaintiff: cynthia L stallings and Cynthia L. Stallings
Defendant: American National Red Cross dba The Arc of Northeastern NC and American National Red Cross d/b/a The Arc of Northeastern NC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00137
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Intradistrict Transfer to Western Division. New Case Number - 5:20-cv-387-D. (Sellers, N.)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Redesignating Division - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 5:20-CV-387-D. No further filing shall be made in 4:20-CV-137-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/20/2020. (Sellers, N.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have to and including, August 19, 2020 within which to serve answers or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/17/2020. (Sellers, N.)
July 17, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Sellers, N.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by American National Red Cross. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order) (Meigs, Carrie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by American National Red Cross (Meigs, Carrie)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff Ernie K. Murray of Etheridge, Hamlett & Murray, LLP at PO Box 10, Nashville, NC 27856 mailed via US Mail on July 15, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
July 15, 2020 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western Division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
July 15, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to American National Red Cross. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
July 15, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Carrie Elizabeth Meigs on behalf of All Defendants. (Meigs, Carrie)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5514726), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - original Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, #4 Supplement supplemental removal cover sheet) (Meigs, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stallings v. American National Red Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: cynthia L stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia L. Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Red Cross dba The Arc of Northeastern NC
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Meigs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Red Cross d/b/a The Arc of Northeastern NC
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Meigs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?