Halifax Regional Medical Center v. UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Halifax Regional Medical Center d/b/a Vidant North Hospital
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare, Inc. and UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00142
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, #19 MOTION to Stay regarding #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jubinsky, Andrew)
September 8, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay regarding #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Halifax Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Pine, Steven)
September 8, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Halifax Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Pine, Steven)
September 8, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Halifax Regional Medical Center. (Pine, Steven)
August 10, 2020 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time #16 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Plaintiff has up to and including September 8, 2020, within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss #8 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/10/2020. (Hockaday, A.)
August 10, 2020 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Stouch, L.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Halifax Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Pine, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #15 Notice of Special Appearance. All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Each attorney must file his or her own notice of appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of other attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. The appropriate form for becoming a registered e-filer in this district is available to out of district counsel on this court's website www.nced.uscourts.gov. (Stouch, L.)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Mark A. Michael on behalf of All Defendants. (Michael, Mark)
August 5, 2020 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United HealthCare Services, Inc., Corporate Parent United Healthcare, Inc., Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Inc. for UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc.. (Michael, Mark)
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealthCare, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United HealthCare Services, Inc., Corporate Parent United HealthGroup, Inc. for UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Michael, Mark)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Gary Steven Qualls on behalf of Halifax Regional Medical Center. (Qualls, Gary)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Halifax Regional Medical Center identifying Corporate Parent University Health Systems of Eastern Carolina, Inc. for Halifax Regional Medical Center. (Pine, Steven)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Gordon Pine on behalf of Halifax Regional Medical Center. (Pine, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support regarding #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Michael, Mark)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Michael, Mark)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Andrew G. Jubinsky on behalf of UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Jubinsky, Andrew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Mark A. Michael on behalf of UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Michael, Mark)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Counsel for Plaintiff, Gary S. Qualls, Susan K. Hackney & Steven G. Pine of K&L GATES at 430 Davis Drive, Suite 400, Morrisville, NC 27560 mailed via US Mail on July 23, 2020. (Rudd, D.)
July 23, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., "Exhibit 1" is not a sufficient description). Additionally, when filing a document with more than five attachments, the first attachment must be an index of all of the subsequent attached documents. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
July 23, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #2 Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the civil cover sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.)
July 23, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
July 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 Declaration regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 4 by UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc. (Jubinsky, Andrew)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Notice filed by UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc. regarding #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Notice - other Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Michael, Mark)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Notice filed by UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc. regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet. (Michael, Mark) (Main Document 2 flattened and replaced on 7/27/2020) (Edwards, S.).
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc. from Halifax Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-401. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0417-5529997), filed by UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc., UnitedHealthCare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State court cover sheet & complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Service of Process Transmittal, #3 Exhibit 3- Service of Process Transmittal, #4 Exhibit 4- Defendants' List of Parties and Counsel) (Michael, Mark) Modified on 7/23/2020 to describe exhibits. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halifax Regional Medical Center v. UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halifax Regional Medical Center d/b/a Vidant North Hospital
Represented By: Gary Steven Qualls
Represented By: Steven Gordon Pine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Michael
Represented By: Andrew G. Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthCare of North Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Michael
Represented By: Andrew G. Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?