Burrus v. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Charity Burrus
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv00155
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Andrew Saul on 9/8/2020. (Stouch, L.)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney General on 9/3/2020. (Stouch, L.)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 USM 285 Form - Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service as to Andrew Saul served on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/1/2020. (Stouch, L.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Stouch, L.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeals Council Action) (Stouch, L.)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 8/17/2020. (Stouch, L.)
August 17, 2020 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #1 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Stouch, L.)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Charity Burrus (Lewis, Evan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Evan G. Lewis on behalf of Charity Burrus. (Lewis, Evan)
August 14, 2020 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is directed to file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 14, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Charity Burrus. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Charity Burrus. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plaintiff's Income and Expenses, #2 Proposed Complaint, #3 Attachment to Proposed Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons Service on USAG, #6 Form 285 for USAG, #7 Proposed Summons Service on Defendant, #8 Form 285 for Defendant, #9 Proposed Summons US Attorney, #10 Form 285 for US Attorney, #11 Text of Proposed Order) (Lewis, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burrus v. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charity Burrus
Represented By: Evan G. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?