Moore et al v. Circosta et al**Do not docket in this case. See case 5:20-cv-507-D.**
Plaintiff: Bobby Heath, Timothy K. Moore, Maxine Whitley, Philip E. Berger and Alan Swain
Defendant: Stella Anderson, Jeff Carmon, III, Karen Brinson Bell and Damon Circosta
Case Number: 4:2020cv00182
Filed: September 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Intradistrict Transfer to Western Division. New case number 5:20-cv-507-D. (Stouch, L.)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Redesignating Division to Western Division. This case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable James C. Dever III, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents should reflect the new case number of 5:20-CV-507-D. No further filings should be made in 4:20-CV-182-D. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/28/2020. (Stouch, L.)
September 28, 2020 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Setting Hearings - Status Conference set for 9/28/2020 at 11:30 AM in Raleigh by video conference in the 7th Floor - Courtroom 1 before District Judge James C. Dever III. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever, III on 9/28/2020. The Clerk's office will contact counsel via email with video conference instructions. (Stouch, L.)
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Related Case filed by STELLA ANDERSON, KAREN BRINSON BELL, JEFF CARMON, III, DAMON CIRCOSTA . (Peters, Alexander)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support regarding #14 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by STELLA ANDERSON, KAREN BRINSON BELL, JEFF CARMON, III, DAMON CIRCOSTA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Letter to Elaine Marshall) (Peters, Alexander)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by STELLA ANDERSON, KAREN BRINSON BELL, JEFF CARMON, III, DAMON CIRCOSTA. (Peters, Alexander)
September 27, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Alexander McClure Peters on behalf of All Defendants. (Peters, Alexander)
September 26, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Peter A. Patterson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Patterson, Peter)
September 26, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by David H. Thompson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Thompson, David)
September 26, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Nathan Andrew Huff on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Huff, Nathan)
September 26, 2020 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support regarding #8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by PHILIP E. BERGER, BOBBY HEATH, TIMOTHY K. MOORE, ALAN SWAIN, MAXINE WHITLEY. (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by PHILIP E. BERGER, BOBBY HEATH, TIMOTHY K. MOORE, ALAN SWAIN, MAXINE WHITLEY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by ALAN SWAIN (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by MAXINE WHITLEY (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by BOBBY HEATH (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by PHILIP E. BERGER (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by TIMOTHY K. MOORE (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Nicole Jo Moss on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Moss, Nicole)
September 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by BOBBY HEATH, PHILIP E. BERGER, TIMOTHY K. MOORE, MAXINE WHITLEY, ALAN SWAIN. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Joint Motion for Consent Judgment in 20CVS8881 (Wake Cnty. Super. Ct. Sept. 22, 2020), #3 Exhibit 2 - Board of Elections Consent Judgment Press Release (Sept. 22, 2020), #4 Exhibit 3 - Numbered Memo 2020-19 (Aug. 21, 2020), #5 Exhibit 4 - Board of Elections Letter (Mar. 26, 2020), #6 Exhibit 5 - Hearing Transcript in 20-cv-0457 (MDNC July 21, 2020), #7 Exhibit 6 - Resignation Letter of David Black (Sept. 23, 2020), #8 Exhibit 7 - Resignation Letter of Ken Raymond (Sept. 23, 2020), #9 Exhibit 8 - Rules Review Commission Meeting Minutes (May 21, 2020), #10 Exhibit 9 - Amend. Compl. in 20-CVS-8881 (Wake Cnty. Super. Ct. Aug. 18, 2020), #11 Exhibit 10 - Amend. Compl. in 20-CVS-05615 (Wake Cnty. Super. Ct. July 8, 2020), #12 Exhibit 11 - Second Amend. Compl. in 20-cv-0457 (MDNC June 18, 2020), #13 Exhibit 12 - Decl. of Tomas Lopez in 20-cv-0457 (MDNC June 18, 2020), #14 Proposed Summons Damon Circosta, #15 Proposed Summons Stella Anderson, #16 Proposed Summons Jeff Carmon III, #17 Proposed Summons Karen Brinson Bell, #18 Civil Cover Sheet) (Moss, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Circosta et al**Do not docket in this case. See case 5:20-cv-507-D.**
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Heath
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Huff
Represented By: Nicole Jo Moss
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy K. Moore
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Huff
Represented By: Nicole Jo Moss
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Whitley
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Huff
Represented By: Nicole Jo Moss
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip E. Berger
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Huff
Represented By: Nicole Jo Moss
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Swain
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Huff
Represented By: Nicole Jo Moss
Represented By: Peter A. Patterson
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Anderson
Represented By: Alexander McClure Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Carmon, III
Represented By: Alexander McClure Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Brinson Bell
Represented By: Alexander McClure Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Circosta
Represented By: Alexander McClure Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?