Rawls v. F/V Little Jesse et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Rawls
Defendant: F/V Little Jesse and Atlantic Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00185
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer M. Techman on behalf of All Defendants. (Techman, Jennifer)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/20/2020. (Sellers, N.)
November 20, 2020 Notice to Counsel regarding: #9 Notice of Special Appearance, #7 Notice of Special Appearance. All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Local Civil Rule 83.1(d) counsel, Jennifer M. Techman, must file a Notice of Appearance on the docket. (Sellers, N.)
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Francis G. McSweeney on behalf of All Defendants. (McSweeney, Francis)
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Atlantic Enterprises, LLC, F/V Little Jesse. (Kiely, Robert)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Robert E. Kiely on behalf of All Defendants. (Kiely, Robert)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Teresa Rawls. Atlantic Enterprises, LLC served on 10/24/2020, answer due 11/14/2020. (Weeks, Stevenson)
October 30, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Sellers, N.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Atlantic Enterprises, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by J. Jefferson Newton on behalf of Teresa Rawls. (Newton, J.)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Teresa Rawls (Weeks, Stevenson)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Stevenson L. Weeks on behalf of Teresa Rawls. (Weeks, Stevenson)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atlantic Enterprises, LLC, F/V Little Jesse, filed by Teresa Rawls. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Weeks, Stevenson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rawls v. F/V Little Jesse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V Little Jesse
Represented By: Robert E. Kiely
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Represented By: Francis G. McSweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Kiely
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Represented By: Francis G. McSweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Rawls
Represented By: J. Jefferson Newton
Represented By: Stevenson L. Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?