Howard v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Clifton Howard
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 4:2021cv00166
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 9 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Kilolo Kijakazi on 11/18/2021. (Stouch, L.)
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 USM 285 Form and USPS Return Receipt - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US Attorney General on 11/17/2021. (Stouch, L.)
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 USM 285 Form - Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service as to Kilolo Kijakazi served on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022. (Stouch, L.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Stouch, L.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Clifton Howard. (Stouch, L.)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 11/4/2021. (Stouch, L.)
November 4, 2021 Remark - Certified copy of #4 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Stouch, L.)
November 3, 2021 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Stouch, L.)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Clifton Howard (Arrowood, Derrick)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Derrick Kyle Arrowood on behalf of Clifton Howard. (Arrowood, Derrick)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Clifton Howard. (Attachments: #1 US Marshal Form, #2 Complaint, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Arrowood, Derrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Howard
Represented By: Derrick Kyle Arrowood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?