Sharpe v. Best et al
Plaintiff: Montoyae Dontae Sharpe
Defendant: Ricky L Best, Jeffrey D. Shrock and City of Greenville NC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00185
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Phillip E. Lewis on behalf of Montoyae Dontae Sharpe. (Lewis, Phillip)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Montoyae Dontae Sharpe. City of Greenville NC waiver sent on 12/20/2021, answer due 2/18/2022. (Rudolf, David)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Montoyae Dontae Sharpe. Jeffrey D. Shrock waiver sent on 12/23/2021, answer due 2/21/2022. (Rudolf, David)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Montoyae Dontae Sharpe. Ricky L Best waiver sent on 12/23/2021, answer due 2/21/2022. (Rudolf, David)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jeffrey D. Shrock on 12/23/2021 by Montoyae Dontae Sharpe. Waiver of Service due by 1/22/2022. (Rudolf, David)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to R.L. "Ricky" Best on 12/23/2021 by Montoyae Dontae Sharpe. Waiver of Service due by 1/22/2022. (Rudolf, David)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court and for the efficient administration of justice, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings should reflect the revised case number of 4:21-CV-185-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/21/2021. (Hockaday, A.)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert S. Mahler on behalf of Montoyae Dontae Sharpe. (Mahler, Robert)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Sonya Pfeiffer on behalf of Montoyae Dontae Sharpe. (Pfeiffer, Sonya)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by David S. Rudolf on behalf of Montoyae Dontae Sharpe. (Rudolf, David)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to City of Greenville on 12/20/2021 by Montoyae Dontae Sharpe. Waiver of Service due by 1/19/2021. (Rudolf, David)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Montoyae Dontae Sharpe (Rudolf, David)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6363367.), filed by Montoyae Dontae Sharpe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudolf, David)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed for defendants' Ricky L. Best and Jeffrey D. Shrock. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharpe v. Best et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montoyae Dontae Sharpe
Represented By: Robert S. Mahler
Represented By: Sonya Pfeiffer
Represented By: David S. Rudolf
Represented By: Phillip E. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky L Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey D. Shrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Greenville NC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?