Windley v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Windley
Defendant: Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Group Incorporated and Cook Medical, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00022
Filed: March 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Case has been opened in the Southern District of Indiana as case 1:22-cv-06771, filed 03/24/2022. (Sellers, N.)
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - This case is transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Indiana for the reasons stated in the order of October 15, 2014, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard L. Young. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Stay lifted on 3/24/2022.) (Sellers, N.)
March 24, 2022 Case transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. File transmitted electronically. (Sellers, N.)
March 14, 2022 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service for Complaint, Cover sheet, summons, filed by Sarah Windley served on Cook Medical LLC, Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, William Cook Europe APS on 03/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cook Group Incorporated, #2 Affidavit Cook Incorporated, #3 Affidavit Cook Medical Incorporated, #4 Affidavit Cook Medical LLC) (Kinsley, Brian)
March 8, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
March 8, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Brian L. Kinsley on behalf of Sarah Windley. (Kinsley, Brian)
March 8, 2022 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sarah Windley (Kinsley, Brian)
March 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6466534.), filed by Sarah Windley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet for Case, #2 Proposed Summons Summons to Cook Incorporated, #3 Proposed Summons Summons to Cook Medical Incorporated, #4 Proposed Summons Summons to Cook Group Incorporated, #5 Proposed Summons Summons to Cook Medical, LLC) (Kinsley, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windley v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Windley
Represented By: Brian L. Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?