Little v. Rene Herse Cycles LTD
Plaintiff: Anthony Justin Little
Defendant: Rene Herse Cycles LTD d/b/a Rene Herse Cycles
Case Number: 4:2022cv00031
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. The parties should review the attached order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/25/2022. (Waddell, K.)
May 24, 2022 Filing 17 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Rene Herse Cycles LTD. (El-Jaouhari, R.)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 5/26/22. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/21/22. (Collins, S.)
April 20, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Rene Herse Cycles LTD. (Wall, F.)
April 7, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by William H. Reaves on behalf of Anthony Justin Little. (Collins, S.)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for Leave to Manually File Notice of Appearance of Counsel by Attorney William Reaves. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/7/2022. (Collins, S.)
April 7, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by G. Wayne Hardee on behalf of Anthony Justin Little. (Collins, S.)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Leave to Manually File Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Attorney G. Wayne Hardee. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/7/2022. (Collins, S.)
April 7, 2022 Notice to Counsel Jeffrey Bilick. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, service of any court generated document (i.e., orders, notices, etc.) will only be made on the attorney(s) registered in CM/ECF. Attorneys G. Wayne Hardee and William Reaves will not receive electronic notification until they have completed their CM/ECF training. This notice is issued for information as co-counsel for plaintiff. The non-registered attorneys will not receive paper copies from the court. (Collins, S.)
April 7, 2022 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #10 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including April 22, 2022, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/7/2022. (Hockaday, A.)
April 7, 2022 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Collins, S.)
April 6, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Rene Herse Cycles LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead) (Wall, F.)
April 6, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Manually File Notice of Appearance of Counsel by Attorney William Reaves filed by Anthony Justin Little. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Notice of Appearance for William Reaves, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Collins, S.) Modified on 4/6/2022 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Manually File Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Attorney G. Wayne Hardee filed by Anthony Justin Little. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Notice of Appearance by G. Wayne Hardee, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Collins, S.) Modified on 4/6/2022 to revise docket text. (Collins, S.).
April 6, 2022 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Anthony Justin Little (Blick, Jeffrey)
April 6, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey J. Blick on behalf of Anthony Justin Little. (Blick, Jeffrey)
April 6, 2022 Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #8 MOTION for Leave to Manually File, #9 MOTION for Leave to Manually File. (Collins, S.)
April 4, 2022 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.)
April 1, 2022 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Wayne Hardee, Jeffrey J. Blick, William H. Reeves of Wayne Hardee Law at 1609 West Arlington Blvd., Suite 105, Greenville, NC 27834 mailed via US Mail on April 1, 2022. (Rudd, D.)
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by R. Robert El-Jaouhari on behalf of Rene Herse Cycles LTD. (El-Jaouhari, R.)
April 1, 2022 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Rene Herse Cycles LTD (Wall, F.)
April 1, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by F. Marshall Wall on behalf of Rene Herse Cycles LTD. (Wall, F.)
April 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Superior Court, Pitt County, case number 22 CVS 2051. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6501069), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2, Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit 3, Notice of Removal to Pitt County) (Wall, F.)
April 1, 2022 ***Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) Modified on 4/1/2022 to change the event type. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little v. Rene Herse Cycles LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Justin Little
Represented By: G. Wayne Hardee
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Blick
Represented By: William H. Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Herse Cycles LTD d/b/a Rene Herse Cycles
Represented By: R. Robert El-Jaouhari
Represented By: F. Marshall Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?