Quast v. English Riding Supply, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Susan Quast
Defendant: English Riding Supply, Inc., ERS Equistrian, Inc.,, English Riding Supply, LLC, English Riding Supply, LLC,, American Specialties, Inc., ITR Industries, Inc., Hopus Technology, Inc. and Aegis Sports, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00077
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice to Counsel of Failure to Make Service within 90 Days regarding defendants: English Riding Supply, Inc., ERS Equistrian, Inc., Hopus Technology, Inc. and Aegis Sports, Inc. Failure to respond to this notice within the time allotted will result in dismissal of the defendants English Riding Supply, Inc., ERS Equistrian, Inc., Hopus Technology, Inc. and Aegis Sports, Inc without prejudice. (Collins, S.)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #11 MOTION to Remand filed by ITR Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Adrienne Rolla, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Grant Kornman, #3 Exhibit 3 Declaration of Robert Codol, #4 Exhibit 4 Declaration of James Thornton) (Thornton, James)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by American Specialties, Inc., English Riding Supply, LLC, ITR Industries, Inc.. (Thornton, James)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Proposed Order regarding #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Susan Quast. (Abrams, Noah)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #11 Motion to Remand - Pursuant to the judge's practice preferences available on the court's website, Local Civil Rule 6.1 and Section I(3) of the court's Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category and be linked to the underlying motion on the docket. (Tripp, S.)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Susan Quast. (Abrams, Noah)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Remand filed by Susan Quast. (Abrams, Noah)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew S. Sullivan on behalf of Susan Quast. (Sullivan, Matthew)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Susan Quast (Abrams, Noah)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Noah Breen Abrams on behalf of Susan Quast. (Abrams, Noah)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - American Specialties, Inc., English Riding Supply, LLC, and ITR Industries, Inc. answer due 8/22/2022. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/15/2022. (Copy served via U.S. Mail upon plaintiff's counsel, Noah B. Abrams, Esq., Abrams & Abrams, P.A., 1526 Glenwood Avenue, Raleigh, NC 27608 and Matthew S. Sullivan, Esq., White & Allen, P.A., PO Box 3169, Kinston, NC 28502.) (Tripp, S.)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent via U.S. Mail on July 15, 2022, to Plaintiff's Counsel, Noah B. Abrams, Esq., Abrams & Abrams, P.A., 1526 Glenwood Avenue, Raleigh, NC 27608 and Matthew S. Sullivan, Esq., White & Allen, P.A., PO Box 3169, Kinston, NC 28502. (Tripp, S.)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by American Specialties, Inc., English Riding Supply, LLC, ITR Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order granting extension of time to answer) (Thornton, James)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by James C. Thornton on behalf of American Specialties, Inc., English Riding Supply, LLC. (Thornton, James)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice to Counsel regarding #3 Financial Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal - Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or "flatten" the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerk's office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No need to refile this time. (Tripp, S.)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Tripp, S.)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by ITR Industries, Inc. (Thornton, James)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by James C. Thornton on behalf of ITR Industries, Inc.. (Thornton, James)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ITR Industries, Inc. from Superior Court, Halifax County, case number 22 CVS 411. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6635764), filed by ITR Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit state court file from Halifax County, #4 Exhibit notice of removal to Halifax County) (Thornton, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quast v. English Riding Supply, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Quast
Represented By: Noah Breen Abrams
Represented By: Matthew S. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: English Riding Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERS Equistrian, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: English Riding Supply, LLC
Represented By: James C. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: English Riding Supply, LLC,
Represented By: James C. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Specialties, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITR Industries, Inc.
Represented By: James C. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopus Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Sports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?