Wallace v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Eugene Wallace
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2009cv00349
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: JOHNSTON
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONSENT ORDER granting 30 Motion for Attorney Fees - Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/06/2010. (Baker, C.)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered June 21, 2010, that plaintiff's motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted and defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings is denied. This matter is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with the court's order. Signed by Clerk of Court on 06/23/2010. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 23 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and, declining to adopt 25 Memorandum and Recommendations. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 06/19/2010. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Wallace
Represented By: Diane S. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?