The Neighbors Law Firm, P.C. et al v. Highland Capital Management, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: The Neighbors Law Firm, P.C. and Patrick E. Neighbors
Defendant: Highland Capital Management, L.P. and Hysky Communications, LLC
Case Number: 5:2009cv00352
Filed: August 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice upon notification of the parties that this matter has settled. Counsel are DIRECTED to file their Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice on or before April 15, 2011. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 3/14/2011. Copies served. (Edwards, S.)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting 106 Emergency MOTION to Disallow De Bene Esse Deposition. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for further instructions. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 3/9/2011. Copies served. (Edwards, S.)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 102 Motion for Reconsideration. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and instructions. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 3/7/2011. Copies served. (Edwards, S.)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion in Limine; granting 86 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 87 Motion in Limine. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and instructions Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 3/4/2011. Copies served. (Edwards, S.)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 77 Motion to Compel. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and instructions. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/23/2011. Copies served. (Edwards, S.)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion to Quash; denying as moot 71 Motion Opposing Expedited Briefing. See order for critical deadlines. The final pretrial conference shall be rescheduled for Friday, 18 February 2011, at 4:00 p.m. in the Fifth Floor Courtroom of the Terry Sanford Federal Building and Courthouse, 310 New Bern Avenue, Raleigh, North Carolina.A revised proposed final pretrial order reflecting any supplementation or revision necessitated by the Chura deposition shall be filed by 2:00 p.m. on 18 February 2011. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/10/2011. CC:counsel, S. Thuemmel, US Magistrate Team in Raleigh. (Edwards, S.)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 53 Motion for Leave to File; mooting 54 Proposed Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 1/24/2011. Copies served. (Edwards, S.)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER finding as moot 45 Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 46 Motion to Compel. If after the parties confer in person or by telephone regarding each interrogatory and request for production that is in dispute there remain differences th ey are unable to resolve, plaintiffs shall be permitted to refile a motion to compel responses to the particular discovery requests then remaining in dispute. Any such motion shall be filed by 2/16/2011. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 1/13/2011. Copies served. (Edwards, S.)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that the stay in this action as to Defendant HySky is lifted;the Motion for Preliminary Injunction at 8 is DENIED as moot;Plaintiffs' claims against HySky are DISMISSED, and Plaintiffs' Motion for Appropriate Relief at 52 is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 12/28/2010 (see order for particulars). Copies served. (Edwards, S.)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - Except as modified herein, the court ADOPTS the Memorandum and Recommendation 39 and it is hereby ORDERED: Plaintiffs' evidentiary objections to the 2/9/2009, HySky board meeting minutes [DE-26-4], HySky's general ledger [DE-26-15 ], HySky accounting report [DE-26-16], HySky's confidential business plans [DE-26-18 and 19], the limited liability company agreement [DE-26-25], transcript of the 1/29/2010, bankruptcy hearing [DE-26-29], 11/12/07 email [DE-26-20], and 9/10/07, email [DE-26-14] are DENIED on the merits. Plaintiffs' remaining evidentiary objections are DENIED as moot. Highland's motion for a continuance pursuant to Rule 56(f) is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment 21 is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to continue the management of this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 9/24/2010. (Foell, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Neighbors Law Firm, P.C. et al v. Highland Capital Management, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Neighbors Law Firm, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick E. Neighbors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hysky Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?