Sanders Champion v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Linda B Sanders Champion
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 5:2009cv00545
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: NASH
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/19/2010. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered July 6, 2010, that defendant's decision is reversed and this action is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/08/2010. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/06/2010. Copies served electronically. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders Champion v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda B Sanders Champion
Represented By: Frederick (Rick) W. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?