WOODY v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: TRACY WOODY
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation, BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America, N.A., BANK OF AMERICA HOME LOANS & INSURANCE, COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC. and Nationwide Trustee Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2010cv00086
Filed: March 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by US District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/28/2011. A copy of the order was mailed to the pro se plaintiff to her address of record. (Sawyer, D.)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 20 Motion to Enjoin and denying 23 Motion to Set Aside. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 8/20/2010. Pro se plaintiff served with copy. (Sawyer, D.)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The court GRANTS the motion to dismiss [D.E. 8] as to Woody's claims against Bank of America Corporation, BACHomeLoans Servicing, L.P., Bank of America, N.A., and Bank ofAmerica Home Loans and Insurance. The court also GRANTS the motion t o dismiss [D.E. 8] as to Woody's RESPA, usury, FCRA, and Colorado law claims against Countrywide. The court DENIES the motion to dismiss [D.E. 8] as to Woody's TILA and Regulation Z claim against Countrywide. Furthermore, the court GRANTS N ationwide's motion to dismiss [D.E. 10], and GRANTS the motion to strike Woody's request for production of documents [D.E. 16]. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 7/20/2010. Copy served to plaintiff via USPS; copies served to counsel via email. (Sawyer, D.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOODY v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY WOODY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Donald R. Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P.
Represented By: Donald R. Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Donald R. Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA HOME LOANS & INSURANCE
Represented By: Donald R. Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC.
Represented By: Donald R. Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Trustee Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jason B. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?