Robinson v. Santrock et al
Plaintiff: Matt Robinson
Defendant: Tracy Santrock, Santrock Realty Group, Inc., Mary McKnight and Sacrilicious Marketing LLC
Case Number: 5:2010cv00226
Filed: June 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Malcolm J. Howard
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Santrock Realty Group, Inc. and Tracy Santrock against Sacrilicious Marketing LLC and Mary McKnight. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 4/15/2011. (Heath, D.)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss as between plaintiff and defendants Tracy Santrock and Santrock Realty Group, Inc. The actions between plaintiff and defendants Mary McKnight and Sacrilicious Marketing, LLC,, and between cross-claimants Tracy Santrock and Santrock Realty Group, Inc. and cross-defendants Mary McKnight and Sacrilicious Marketing, LLC, shall continue. Signed by Senior Judge Malcolm J. Howard on 1/4/2011. (Lee, L.)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Entry of Default against Cross-Defendants Mary McKnight and Sacrilicious Marketing, LLC for the crossclaim filed by Cross-Claimants Tracy Santrock and Santrock Realty Group, Inc. Signed by Julie Richards, Chief Deputy Clerk of Court on 9/7/10. (Lee, L.)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Entry of Default as to Sacrilicious Marketing, LLC. Signed by Dennis P. Iavarone, Clerk of Court on 9/2/2010. (Heath, D.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Santrock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Robinson
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Santrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santrock Realty Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacrilicious Marketing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?