General Parts Distribution LLC v. Perry
Plaintiff: General Parts Distribution LLC
Defendant: Jennison Perry
Case Number: 5:2012cv00310
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER denying as moot 114 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting 123 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying 148 Motion to Stay. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 4/12/2013. (Edwards, S.)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 58 Motion for court-hosted settlement conference. Plaintiffs and defendant shall conduct a court-hosted settlement conference before US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on or before January 31, 2013. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 12/20/2012. (Sawyer, D.)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 3 Motion to Transfer Case, 9 Motion to Remand, 19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 21 Motion to Expedite, and 25 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/10/2012. (Sawyer, D.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Parts Distribution LLC v. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Parts Distribution LLC
Represented By: Jerry H. Walters, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Robert Crosswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennison Perry
Represented By: Frank J. Gordon
Represented By: Troy J. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?