Mabeley v. MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Gregory M. Mabeley
Defendant: PCS Sales (USA), Inc., FIBA Technologies, Inc., Richards Industries, Inc., MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc., MEMC Pasadena, Inc. and PCS Phosphate Company, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2012cv00373
Filed: June 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: JOHNSTON
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - The court has been advised that the parties have settled all matters in controversy among them. Therefore, this matter is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party to file a motion to reopen the case should settlement not be consummated within forty-five (45) days hereof. The parties are directed to file their Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice on or before Thursday, April 10, 2014. As there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as an open one for statistical purposes, this case is removed from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 02/24/2014. (Baker, C.)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Reflect Corporate Name Change and Amend Case Caption - The Court directs the Clerk of Court to amend the case caption and any relevant Court records to change MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc.'s name to SunEdison, Inc. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/03/2013. (Baker, C.)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/19/2013. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mabeley v. MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCS Sales (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Andrew A. Bennington
Represented By: Kevin Lee Chignell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIBA Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Bradford A. De Vore
Represented By: W. Clark Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richards Industries, Inc.
Represented By: William W. Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Marc C. Tucker
Represented By: Eric A. Snider
Represented By: Bradley M. Risinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEMC Pasadena, Inc.
Represented By: Marc C. Tucker
Represented By: Eric A. Snider
Represented By: Bradley M. Risinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCS Phosphate Company, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew A. Bennington
Represented By: Kevin Lee Chignell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory M. Mabeley
Represented By: Randall J. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?