Hawley v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Tonya Hawley
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2012cv00645
Filed: October 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: JOHNSTON
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/23/2015. The parties are reminded to read the order in its entirety. (Downing, L.)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 34 Consent Motion for Attorney Fees under the EAJA. It is ordered that the Commissioner pay to the plaintiff the sum of $3,515.00, sent to Plaintiff's counsel's office. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 12/6/2013. (Fisher, M.)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, and DENYING 25 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. This matter is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with this order. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 11/14/2013. (Fisher, M.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawley v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Hawley
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Represented By: Peter A. Heinlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?