Myers et al v. The State of North Carolina et al
Plaintiff: Loushonda Myers, C.M., A.M. and M.M.
Defendant: The State of North Carolina, Krista L. Bennet, Fern Gunn Simeon, John Silverstein, Unknown agents of the North Carolina State Bar, Steve Bizzell, A.C. Fish, C.K. Allen, Don Pate, J. Creech, J. Canady, A. Case, D. Daughtry, Lieutenant Stewart, Danny Johnson, Billis/Gillis, Unknown officers and agents of the Johnston County Sheriff's Department, Carmen Carrae, Kimberly Franklin, Unknown officers and agents of the Johnston County Department of Social Services, Keith Underwood, Bethany Hale, Walter Stanley, Susan Doyle, Adren Harris, Aleta Ballard, Attorney Steven Walker, Donnie Harrison, Unknown officers/agents of the Wake County Sheriff's Department, Ballard Law Firm, PLLC, Walker Law Firm, PLLC, Johnston County, North Carolina, North Carolina Court System, Office of Indigent Services, Johnston County Public Defender's Office, Johnston County District Attorney's Office and Wake County, North Carolina
Case Number: 5:2012cv00714
Filed: November 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: JOHNSTON
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER denying 287 Motion to Disqualify Judge, denying 288 Motion to Alter Judgment, granting 295 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 302 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying as moot 306 Motion for Default Judgment, and denying 308 Motion for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Rule 60(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 1/15/2016. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail to 27 Wateree Trail, Georgetown, SC 29440. (Romine, L.)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER denying 264 Motion to Compel; denying 270 Motion to Compel; allowing 271 Motion to Quash; and allowing 276 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 7/27/2015. (Romine, L.)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER DENYING 250 Plaintiff's Motion in Opposition to Bryan Konig's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 1/20/2015. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff, via US Mail, to 27 Wateree Trail, Georgetown, SC, 29440. (Fisher, M.)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER DENYING 194 Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Clerical Mistake; DENYING 195 Plaintiff's Motion for a More Definite Statement; GRANTING 221 Defendants AT&T, AT&T Mobility, and Unknown Agents of AT&T's Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING 225 Defendant BB&T's Motion to Dismiss and Strike All Mention of Minors; GRANTING 234 Defendant Bryan Konig's Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 237 Plaintiff's Motion to Deny Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 238 Plaintiff& #039;s Motion to Deny Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; 239 Plaintiff's Motion for Oral Hearing; DENYING 240 Plaintiff's Motion for Oral Hearing; DENYING 241 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for a Court Order; DENYING 242 Plaintif f's Motion for Joinder; DENYING 243 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; and DENYING 246 Plaintiff's Motion for Assitance of Counsel. Any reference to Tyre Myers, Dameon Myers, and minor children as plaintiffs to this action is stricken. This matter may now proceed in its entirety. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 12/2/2014. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff, via US Mail, to 27 Wateree Trail, Georgetown, SC, 29440. (Fisher, M.)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER DENYING 181 Plaintiff's Motion for Access to Pacer to File Electronically. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever, III on 1/16/2014. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER denying 171 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) and granting 172 Motion to Stay pending ruling on plaintiff's interlocutory appeal. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/1/2013. A copy of the order was mailed to the pro se plaintiff. (Sawyer, D.)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER: the court GRANTS defendants' motions to strike 81 , 99 , 101 , 115 all references to Myers's minor children as parties. The children are no longer parties. The court GRANTS the motions to dismiss with prejudice as to defendants (1) The State of North Carolina, North Carolina Court System, Office of Indigent Defense Services, Keith Underwood, Bethany Hale, Walter Stanley, and Johnston County Public Defender's Office 35 , (2) The Johnston CountySheriff's Departmen t 140 , (3) Steven Walker and Walker Law Firm, PLLC 78 , (4) Aleta Ballard and Ballard Law Firm, PLLC 81 , (5) Krista Bennett, John Silverstein, Fern Gunn Simeon, and Unknown Agents of the North Carolina State Bar 101 , and (6) North Carolina De partment of Health and Human Services 115 . The claims against these defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. As for the remaining defendants, the court GRANTS without prejudice their motions to dismiss 35 , 64 , 99 , 138 . Myers may file an ame nded complaint against these other defendants but any amended complaint must comply with this order and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Myers may file such an amended complaint not later than September 3, 2013. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/16/2013. A copy of the Order was mailed to the pro se plaintiff. (Sawyer, D.)
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER denying 86 Motion for Electronic Delivery of Papers. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 7/5/2013. Copy mailed to plaintiff via US Mail at address on record. (Marsh, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers et al v. The State of North Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loushonda Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krista L. Bennet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fern Gunn Simeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown agents of the North Carolina State Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bizzell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.C. Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.K. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Creech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Canady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Daughtry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billis/Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown officers and agents of the Johnston County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Carrae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown officers and agents of the Johnston County Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adren Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleta Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Steven Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnie Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown officers/agents of the Wake County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballard Law Firm, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker Law Firm, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnston County, North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Court System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Indigent Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnston County Public Defender's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnston County District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wake County, North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?